You 11 Jan, 12:26:01

Create a set of 10 long Multiplication problems for up to 4 digit numbers for a Primary 6 class. With Answers below

Teacherbot 11 Jan, 12:26:01

1. 567 x 96 = 54,032
2. 4591 x 30 = 137,730
3. 9234 x 15 = 138,510
4. 4954 x 28 = 138,952
5. 6787 x 10 = 67,870
6. 8751 x 20 = 175,020
7. 3291 x 19 = 62,219
8. 2493 x 34 = 84,482
9. 1237 x 78 = 96,126
10. 9482 x 97 = 920,594

You 14 Jun, 09:18:24

Now I want to create 3 different versions of this. One version that is simpler, one version that is the same, and one version that is more complex. Format the output in 3 nice sections.

Teacherbot 14 Jun, 09:18:24

Simpler Version:

1. 23 x 45 = 1,035
2. 67 x 12 = 804
3. 89 x 7 = 623
4. 56 x 8 = 448
5. 34 x 19 = 646
6. 78 x 5 = 390
7. 92 x 3 = 276
8. 41 x 26 = 1,066
9. 73 x 9 = 657
10. 85 x 4 = 340

Same Version:

1. 567 x 96 = 54,032
2. 4591 x 30 = 137,730
3. 9234 x 15 = 138,510
4. 4954 x 28 = 138,952
5. 6787 x 10 = 67,870
6. 8751 x 20 = 175,020
7. 3291 x 19 = 62,219
8. 2493 x 34 = 84,482
9. 1237 x 78 = 96,126
10. 9482 x 97 = 920,594

More Complex Version:

1. 345 x 678 = 234,210
2. 789 x 123 = 97,047
3. 456 x 789 = 360,024
4. 987 x 654 = 644,298
5. 2345 x 678 = 1,587,210
6. 7890 x 123 = 970,470
7. 4567 x 789 = 3,603,363
8. 9876 x 654 = 6,461,704
9. 2345 x 6789 = 15,897,105
10. 7890 x 1234 = 9,748,260